Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barbara Danziger, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Unknown, against Roy Enos, represented by Simon J. Katzen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 1992 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - MACMORRIS & CARBONE - SAN JOSE KATZEN, SIMON J. 550 S. WINCHESTER BLVD. #400 SAN JOSE, CA 95128 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - HANNON, LAW OFFICES OF T. PATRICK 806 BUCKWOOD COURT SAN JOSE, CA 95120-3306 (408) 371-5980 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 22, 1993 | Hearing | Hearing: Dismissal after settlement | |
June 15, 1993 | Hearing | Conference: Further Case Management | |
May 27, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PREJ. BY T. PATRICK HANNON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 12, 1993 | Hearing | Conference: Early Settlement | |
May 05, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Text = MOTION Description SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT BY ATTY T. PATRICK HANNON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 04, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Text = MOTION Description SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT BY ATTY SIMON KATZEN Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 13, 1993 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.