Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Continental Corporation, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Marc D. Paisin, against Roof Care Coproration, represented by David John Sasseen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 1992 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - PAISIN, LAW OFFICE OF MARC DAVID PAISIN, MARC DAVID 440 GRAND AVE SUITE 420 OAKLAND, CA 94610 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - SASSEEN, LAW OFFICE OF DAVID J. SASSEEN, DAVID J. 84 WEST SANTA CLARA STREET STE 560 SAN JOSE, CA 95113 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 11, 1993 | Hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
December 17, 1992 | Hearing | Hearing: Dismissal after settlement | |
October 14, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = MOTION Description VOUCHER RECEIVED BACK W/O DECL. - SENT BACK TO MR. KATZEN FOR DECL. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 09, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = MOTION Description VOUCHER RECEIVED - SENT BACK FOR DECL. - SETTLE BEFORE ARB AWARD Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 07, 1992 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description SETTLED PER DAVID SASSEEN Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 07, 1992 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description ** ARB PACKET CLEANED ** Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 21, 1992 | Hearing | Review: Arbitration Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.