Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lucie Marx Matzley, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case against Anthony Schiavone, represented by Gary K. Flynn, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 1992 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - FLYNN ROSE & PERKINS FLYNN, GARY K. 59 NO. SANTA CRUZ AVE, SUITE Q LOS GATOS, CA 95030 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 26, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 24, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION W/O PREJ. BY MILTON D. ROSENBERG Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 15, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
May 04, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
March 18, 1993 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description NOTICE OF NON APPEARANCE AT CMC FILED BY GARY FLYNN FOR ANTHONY SCHIAVONE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 23, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
December 03, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 14, 1992 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY JUDGE STONE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.