Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Corey Delta Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William H. Mcinerney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 1991 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - MCINERNEY & DILLON MCINERNEY JR., WILLIAM H. ONE KAISER PLAZA, SUITE 1850 OAKLAND, CA 94612 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 31, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP OF ENTIRE ACTION BY ATTY WILLIAM MC INERNEY JR. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 21, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
December 23, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT FILED BY WILLIAM MC INERNEY Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 23, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 23, 1991 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING NON-JUDICIAL ARB PER AGREEMENT OF PLTF & DEFT BY JUDGE KOMAR Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.