Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cao Van Tran M.D., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 1991 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 17, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 8 |
|
September 15, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP OF ENTIRE ACTION BY ATTY DAVID TOLLNER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 14, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
December 20, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY: DAVID H. TOLLNER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 20, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.