Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Isadore Shapiro, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Red Lion Inns Operating L.P., represented by Shea & Mcintyre, Apc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 1992 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - POPELKA ALLARD A.P.C. ALLARD, BERNARD J. ONE ALMADEN BLVD., SUITE 800 SAN JOSE, CA 95113 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 03, 1992 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Text = Result Text: 899 - JUDGMENT ENTERED ON AWARD ENTRY OF ARBITRATION JUDGMENT Decision = M Closed = 01/15/1993 |
|
December 03, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = MOTION Description VOUCHER RECEIVED Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 03, 1992 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Result Text: 899 - JUDGMENT ENTERED ON AWARD AWARD OF ARBITRATOR Decision = M Closed = 01/15/1993 |
|
October 30, 1992 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Result Text: 399 - EVENT HELD ARB HEARING DATE Decision = M Closed = 10/30/1992 |
|
August 18, 1992 | Hearing |
Review: Arbitration Order
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
July 07, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 07, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
July 02, 1992 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE BY BERNARD J. ALLARD FILED 7/2/92 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.