Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Computer Software Tehcnology Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Citel Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 1984 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Case Purged Operator: GT Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 09/08/1997 |
|
January 24, 1985 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 86 |
|
January 24, 1985 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Non Payment Heard By: Pro Tem H. Diel Department 27 Decision = M Closed = 01/24/1985 |
|
December 14, 1984 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/14/1984 |
|
December 14, 1984 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.