Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Allen Robert M Attorney At Law, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lopez Leslie L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 1985 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 1988 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 96 |
|
March 10, 1988 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Hearing Motion: Sc15 -- Order Of Examination Decision = M Closed = 03/10/1988 |
|
March 03, 1988 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 96 |
|
March 03, 1988 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Hearing Motion: Sc15 -- Order Of Examination Heard By: Commissioner J. Triplett Department 25 Decision = M Closed = 03/03/1988 |
|
February 04, 1988 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 96 |
|
February 04, 1988 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Hearing Motion: Sc15 -- Order Of Examination Heard By: Commissioner J. Triplett Department 25 Continuance Scheduled For: 03/10/1988 Decision = M Closed = 02/04/1988 |
|
January 22, 1985 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 96 |
|
January 22, 1985 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = No Recorded Comments Decision = M Closed = 01/22/1985 |
|
December 03, 1984 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 03, 1984 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/03/1984 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.