Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Faith C. Davies filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1975 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 1997 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PILLSBURY MADISON & SUTRO - SAN FRANCISCO BOTTO, GARY E. P.O. BOX 7880 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94120-7880 (000) 000-0000 XATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PILLSBURY MADISON & SUTRO - SAN FRANCISCO BOTTO, GARY E. P.O. BOX 7880 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94120-7880 (000) 000-0000 XATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: PILLSBURY MADISON & SUTRO - SAN FRANCISCO BOTTO, GARY E. P.O. BOX 7880 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94120-7880 (000) 000-0000 X Decision = M Closed = 09/21/1997 |
|
March 17, 1995 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = MOTION Description PRF OF SERV/REGULAR MAIL NTC OF REMVL OF TRSTS & ORDER REMOVING TRUSTS TO LISTING 03/14/95 Decision = C Closed = 09/21/1997 |
|
February 27, 1995 | Hearing |
Hearing: Petition
Judge: Department 15 |
|
January 19, 1995 | Docket Event |
Motion (Probate) Text = MOTION Description NTC OF HRG RE: PTN FOR ORDER REMOVING TRUST FROM CONT. JURISDIC. OF COURT (CLINE) 2-17-95 Legacy Name = Ntc of Hearing [fee] Decision = C Closed = 09/21/1997 |
|
January 19, 1995 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = MOTION Description > PTN FILED BY PAUL DAVIES JR., JUDITH WASHBURN & FAITH DAVIES TO REMOVE TRUST (CLINE) Legacy Name = Initiating Petition for ___ Decision = C Closed = 09/21/1997 |
|
December 11, 1975 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.