Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maragret Alvarez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jose R. Alvarez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Constance E. Jimenez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConstance E. Jimenez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 1975 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = compromise of arrears Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2013 |
|
November 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing: Other
Judge: Department 94 |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Text = order on app to be relieved as atty on completion of ltd scope rep /lgm Legacy Name = FL Order Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2009 |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Text = s/f /lgm Legacy Name = FL Order After Hrg Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2009 |
|
May 07, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing: Other
Judge: Department 94 |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Text = s/f oah; cont to 11/5/09 @ 1:30pm d-94 for fnl review if current Legacy Name = FL Order After Hrg Decision = M Closed = 06/02/2009 |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Warrant: Issued Text = rsp-$150k issued 5-29-2008 /lgm Legacy Name = FL Bench Warrant Decision = M Closed = 12/11/2008 |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Warrant: Issued Text = rsp-$150k issued 8-23-2007 /lgm Legacy Name = FL Bench Warrant Decision = M Closed = 12/11/2008 |
|
December 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing: Return of Warrant
Judge: Department 94 |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Legacy Name = FL Order After Hrg Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.