Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garciajasso, Juan Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2016 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation: Owner Responsibility | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.