Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rodriguez, Jhosea Arthur Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2016 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to MSB | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Pending MSB | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Decision Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.