Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sonia Anjelica Tubera, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to MSB | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Pending MSB | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | No Abstract Reported To DMV | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.