Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Thong, Sophea, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | *Collections: Completed | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Hold |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.