Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Saenz, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2016 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.