We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Hayes, Marla Sue Vs Laumeyer, Lawrence Joseph

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Hayes Marla Sue, filed a(n) Domestic Abuse case against Laumeyer Ii Lawrence Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Wapello County. This case was filed in Wapello County Superior Courts District.

Case Details for Hayes Marla Sue v. Laumeyer Ii Lawrence Joseph

Filing Date

April 04, 2024

Category

Domestic Abuse

Last Refreshed

April 06, 2024

Filing Location

Wapello County, IA

Filing Court House

District

Parties for Hayes Marla Sue v. Laumeyer Ii Lawrence Joseph

Plaintiffs

Hayes Marla Sue

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Laumeyer Ii Lawrence Joseph

Case Events for Hayes Marla Sue v. Laumeyer Ii Lawrence Joseph

Type Description
Docket Event Petition for Relief from Domestic Abuse
Docket Event TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER
HEARING 04/15/2024 09:30 AM 90CV. / COPY TO PROTECTED PARTY
See all events

Related Content in Wapello County

Case

GREENSTATE CREDIT UNION V DANIEL, BRIAN
Jul 17, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 08901 LALA106771

Case

DISCOVER BANK VS DOWNEN, ROBERT
Jul 10, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 08901 LALA106766

Case

IN THE MATTER OF NAME CHANGE OF E.Y.L.R.M.
Jul 11, 2024 | Change of Name | Change of Name | 08901 CNEQ114215

Case

NAME CHANGE OF TMA
Jul 12, 2024 | Change of Name | Change of Name | 08901 CNEQ114216

Case

SHELBY CUNDIFF V KAIDEN SHERWOOD
Jul 12, 2024 | Domestic Abuse | Domestic Abuse | 08901 DAEQ114214

Case

SALAMANCA, HECTOR V OTTUMWA REGIONAL HEALTH, ET AL
Jul 16, 2024 | DJ01 | EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION | EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION | 08901 LALA106769

Case

GUARDIANSHIP OF CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GALVAN
Jul 15, 2024 | GUARDIANSHIP - ADULT | GUARDIANSHIP - ADULT | 08901 GCPR009063

Case

RUPE, EMILY VS MERCHANT, JUSTIN
May 08, 2024 | Domestic Abuse | Domestic Abuse | 08901 DAEQ114220

Case

DISCOVER BANK V. SHANE SMITH
May 28, 2024 | ROSENBERG SCOTT D | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 08901 LALA106767

Case

NAME CHANGE OF GLENDA CLOKE
Jul 15, 2024 | Change of Name | Change of Name | 08901 CNEQ114219

Case

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA V BOWMAN, MICAELA
Jul 17, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 08901 LALA106770

Case

CANIUS, DARLEY MARCKING VS TERTULIEN, WESTER
Jul 17, 2024 | Domestic Abuse | Domestic Abuse | 08901 DAEQ114221

Case

ESTATE OF RITA K. DOWNING
Jul 16, 2024 | Small Estate | Small Estate | 08901 ESPR009062

Case

ESTATE OF ORRIN WAYNE MCCARTY
Nov 09, 2022 | Estate | Estate | 08901 ESPR009064

Case

REBECCA A. BAKER V MERS, AMERICAN ADVISORS GROUP
Jul 15, 2024 | OTHER REAL PROPERTY | OTHER REAL PROPERTY | 08901 EQEQ114218

Case

ESTATE OF TERRY B HOLLINGSWORTH
Jul 11, 2024 | TRANSCRIPT OF ESTATE | TRANSCRIPT OF ESTATE | 08901 ESPR009059

Case

ESTATE OF STEVEN C. MCCLAIN, SR.
Feb 19, 2024 | TRANSCRIPT OF ESTATE | TRANSCRIPT OF ESTATE | 08901 ESPR009060

Case

CONSERVATORSHIP FOR MICHAEL J. MCKAY
Jul 16, 2024 | CONSERVATORSHIP - ADULT | CONSERVATORSHIP - ADULT | 08901 GCPR009061

Case

DISCOVER BANK V BUCHANAN, BARRY
Jul 16, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 08901 LALA106768