We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Charles W. Coldren

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Bovee, Michael Rodney filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Clay County. This case was filed in Clay County Superior Courts District.

Case Details for v.

Filing Date

May 01, 2024

Category

Estate

Last Refreshed

May 04, 2024

Filing Location

Clay County, IA

Filing Court House

District

Parties for v.

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Other Parties

Bovee, Michael Rodney (Attorney)

Coldren Charles W (Deceased Individual)

Coldren Joann (Executor)

Coldren, Charles W Estate Of (Obligor)

Case Events for v.

Type Description
Docket Event LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT
Docket Event ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING EXECUTOR
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF APPROVAL OF WILL
Docket Event DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY
Docket Event LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DECEASED
WILL
Docket Event PETITION IN PROBATE - ESTATE CONSERVATORSHIP OR TRUST
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF EXECUTOR
Docket Event OATH
COURT OFFICER'S OATH
See all events

Related Content in Clay County

Case

AAA COLLECTIONS INC VS WRIGHT, KELLY J
Jul 05, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 03211 LACV036176

Case

LAST WILL & TESTAMENT DARIN MCKINLEY FREEMAN
Jul 09, 2024 | WILL ONLY | WILL ONLY | 03211 ESPR014855

Case

IN THE ESTATE OF DEANE G. ANDERSON
Jun 20, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014849

Case

PER MAR SECURITY VS BREW OIL
Jun 26, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 03211 LACV036162

Case

ESTATE OF PATRICIA CHRISTENSON
Jul 15, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014856

Case

BERNICE M. EMERSON V. WELLSPRING PROPERTIES, L.L.C
Jun 27, 2024 | PI - PREMISES LIABILITY | PI - PREMISES LIABILITY | 03211 LACV036163

Case

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ELLEN JANE SANDVIG
Jul 08, 2024 | WILL ONLY | WILL ONLY | 03211 ESPR014854

Case

L. F. NOLL, INC V BRENA ANN STEVEN
Jun 26, 2024 | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION | 03211 LACV036161

Case

RAMONA J. WALDSTEIN ESTATE
Jun 27, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014850

Case

P.W VS CHINN, AUSTIN DAVID
Jul 10, 2024 | DOMESTIC ABUSE JUVENILE | DOMESTIC ABUSE JUVENILE | 03211 DACV036186

Case

IN RE THE NAME CHANGE OF: HUNTER JOSHUA FULTON NELSON
Jul 08, 2024 | Change of Name | Change of Name | 03211 CNCV036181

Case

DALE E. PECK ESTATE
Jul 02, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014852

Case

WINIFRED IRENE RAVENSCROFT ESTATE
Jul 17, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014857

Case

WELLPOINT IOWA, INC. VS BOLYARD, BRADLEY
Jul 03, 2024 | Other | Other | 03211 LNCV036170

Case

ESTATE OF RUTH A. COLEMAN
Jun 20, 2024 | Estate | Estate | 03211 ESPR014848

Case

WILLIAM J. MYERS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 9/27/2011
Jul 03, 2024 | Trust | Trust | 03211 TRPR014853

Case

MIRANDA RAE BLOOM-SPEIGHT VS AUSTIN JAMES SPEIGHT
Jun 24, 2024 | Domestic Abuse | Domestic Abuse | 03211 DACV036158

Case

COMMUNITY STATE BANK VS. MICHAEL A. JACOBSON
Jul 15, 2024 | OTHER ACTIONS | OTHER ACTIONS | 03211 CVCV036191