Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Robbins, Ruth Ellen, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Completed | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear MSB | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Hold |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.