We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Estate Of Stanley B. Best

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

Agriland Fs, Inc, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Meyers, David Thomas, against Ramsey Grinding, Llc, Ramsey Samantha Lea, in the jurisdiction of Carroll County. This case was filed in Carroll County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Agriland Fs, Inc v. Ramsey Grinding, Llc , et al.

Filing Date

March 05, 2024

Category

Small Estate

Last Refreshed

March 08, 2024

Practice Area

Probate

Filing Location

Carroll County, IA

Matter Type

Estate Administration

Parties for Agriland Fs, Inc v. Ramsey Grinding, Llc , et al.

Plaintiffs

Agriland Fs, Inc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Meyers, David Thomas

Defendants

Ramsey Grinding, Llc

Ramsey Samantha Lea

Other Parties

Best Mary Kay (Executor)

Best Stanley Bernard (Deceased Individual)

Best Stanley Estate (Obligor)

Bruner, David Stanley (Attorney)

Case Events for Agriland Fs, Inc v. Ramsey Grinding, Llc , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF APPROVAL OF WILL
Docket Event LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT
Docket Event INVENTORY REPORT
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE PER 633.231 AND 633.304A
Docket Event ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING EXECUTOR
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE PER 633.230 AND 633.304
Docket Event LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DECEASED
Docket Event DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY
Docket Event OTHER EVENT
ELECTION OF SURVIVING SPOUSE
Docket Event PETITION IN PROBATE - ESTATE CONSERVATORSHIP OR TRUST
PETITION FOR SMALL ESTATE ADMINISTRATION
See all events

Related Content in Carroll County

Case

GUARDIANSHIP OF LANA MARIE FERRARI
Jul 10, 2024 | GUARDIANSHIP - ADULT | GUARDIANSHIP - ADULT | 02851 GCPR031507

Case

DRAVEN W. KRYZAK GUARDIANSHIP/CONSERVATORSHIP
Jul 10, 2024 | GUARDIAN/CONSERVATORSHIP-ADULT | GUARDIAN/CONSERVATORSHIP-ADULT | 08562 GCPR012850

Case

ESTATE OF DONALD DEAN COMBS
Jul 09, 2024 | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | 08261 ESPR011219

Case

VANEDA DOYEN
Jul 10, 2024 | Small Estate | Small Estate | 01381 ESPR102809

Case

EUGENE H ZABEL SMALL ESTATE
Jul 08, 2024 | Small Estate | Small Estate | 02091 ESPR004776

Case

ESTATE OF PHILIP L CLEVENGER *WILL W/O PRES ADMIN*
Jul 09, 2024 | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | 05501 ESPR038249

Case

SMALL ESTATE OF MARSHALL C TRELEVEN
Jul 05, 2024 | Small Estate | Small Estate | 05501 ESPR038248

Case

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ELLEN JANE SANDVIG
Jul 08, 2024 | WILL ONLY | WILL ONLY | 03211 ESPR014854

Case

DOROTHY M JOHNSON ESTATE
Jul 08, 2024 | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | WITHOUT PRESENT ADMINISTRATION | 02171 ESPR032072

Ruling

Estate of Zuno
Jul 10, 2024 | 24PB-0032428
ESTATE OF JOSE ZUNO Case Number: 24PB-0032428 This matter is on calendar for hearing on an Amended Petition for Probate of Will. The matter has been properly noticed, with proof of service on file. Proof of proper publication has been filed. The heirs have waived the bond requirement. No objections have been raised. The paperwork appears to be in order. The Petition is GRANTED. A proposed Order was lodged with the Court and will be executed. The Will is admitted to probate, and the original will shall be filed. The requirement of a bond has been properly waived, and letters shall issue. The matter is set for Monday, November 18, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for Confirmation of Filing the Inventory and Appraisal. The matter is set for Monday, July 14, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for Status of Administration. The personal representative is ORDERED to comply with Probate Code section 12200 et seq. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar. TRUSTS

Ruling

Estate of Auld
Jul 10, 2024 | 23PB-0032084
ESTATE OF MARY AULD Case Number: 23PB-0032084 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on the Petition for Letters of Administration. A Stipulation has been filed requesting the appointment of Terrance Davis as Administrator. The Stipulation was not signed by all intestate heirs. The intestate heirs have not been given notice that Terrence Davis will be appointed as administrator. This matter is continued to Monday, August 26, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44. Mr. Hunt is requested to give notice of hearing for the continued date to all intestate heirs, as well as notice that Terrence Davis will be appointed that day if there is no objection. In the alternative, all other intestate heirs can execute a consent. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

2023PRDE013988
Jul 10, 2024 | Roger L. Lund | Hearing on Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and Petition for Statutory Attorney's Fees | 2023PRDE013988
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 2023PRDE013988: IN THE MATTER OF DAVID HARRELL 07/10/2024 in Department J6 Hearing on Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and Petition for Statutory Attorney's Fees Petitioner states that since she is the residuary beneficiary no accounting is necessary. However, Probate Code §10954(a) states: “Notwithstanding any other provision of this part, the personal representative is not required to file an account if any of the following conditions is satisfied as to each person entitled to distribution from the estate: (1) the person has executed and filed a written waiver of account or a written acknowledgment that the person’s interest has been satisfied.” Petitioner to file an accounting or either a waiver of account by Paul Lee Harrell or written acknowledgment that Paul Lee Harrell’s interest has been satisfied. Petitioner has not provided all of the information required by CRC 7.550(b): (2) sales, purchases or exchanges of assets (3) changes in the form of assets This is necessary as any loss on sale would reduce the statutory fee calculation. Upon filing of either a waiver of account by Paul Lee Harrell or written acknowledgment that Paul Lee Harrell’s interest has been satisfied and a verified supplement providing all of the information required at CRC 7.550(b), the court intends to accept the waiver, approve the report, approve voluntarily reduced statutory attorney fees of $27,000.00, approve a reserve of $250.00 for costs, and approve proposed distribution consistent with decedent’s will. If either a waiver by Paul Lee Harrell or written acknowledgment that Paul Lee Harrell’s interest has been satisfied is not filed, the court will require executor to file an accounting. _________________ The Court uses Zoom exclusively for remote appearances in Department J6. For information on the Zoom procedures, and for general information regarding Judge Lund and his courtroom rules and procedures, please visit: http://www.judgerogerlund.com.

Ruling

Estate of Lloyd
Jul 11, 2024 | 24PB-0032480
ESTATE OF ANDREW LLOYD Case Number: 24PB-0032480 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Letters of Administration. The matter has been properly noticed, with proof of service on file. Proper proof of publication has been filed. No objections have been raised. The paperwork appears to be in order. The Petition is GRANTED. A proposed Order was lodged with the Court and will be executed. Letters will issue upon confirmation of issuance of a bond in the amount of $400,000.00. The matter is set for Monday, November 18, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for Confirmation of Filing the Inventory and Appraisal. The matter is set for Monday, July 14, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for Status of Administration. The personal representative is ORDERED to comply with Probate Code section 12200 et seq. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

Estate of COLLINS
Jul 11, 2024 | CVPB20-0030822
ESTATE OF CANDACE COLLINS Case Number: CVPB20-0030822 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on the Motion to Vacate the Court’s Prior Order dated June 27, 2022, and for Status of Family Court Proceedings. At the prior hearing on June 10, 2024, the Court was informed a pending motion in another department could make an estate proceeding unnecessary. No Status Report has been filed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to provide the Court with a status.

Ruling

In Re: ALICE TAYLOR 1998TRUST
Jul 10, 2024 | CVPB21-0031216
IN RE: ALICE TAYLOR 1998 TRUST Case Number: CVPB21-0031216 This matter is on calendar for status of settlement. A Status Report has been filed which indicates that additional time is needed to possibly resolve the matter. This matter is continued to Monday, October 7, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for status of settlement. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

In Re the Conservatorship of Biddle, Ava
Jul 12, 2024 | S-PR-0012533
S-PR-0012533 In Re the Conservatorship of Biddle, Ava No appearance is required for conservatorship review hearing. All needed post- appointment filings appear to have been filed and served as required. Court investigator will complete an annual review in 2025 according to standard court practices.

Ruling

In Re the Guardianship of Guldager, Scarlett Rose
Jul 12, 2024 | S-PR-0012959
S-PR-0012959 In Re the Guardianship of Guldager, Scarlett Rose Appearance is required for rehearing on petition for appointment of temporary guardians of the person. Missing notice of hearing. Missing 5 court days' personal service of notice of hearing to mother and minor as previously ordered or C.R.C. 7.52 declaration efforts to locate and serve each of them. 1:31 PM

Document

In the matter of: Purrington, Winifred W
Jun 19, 2024 | Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | MI24P3324EA

Document

In the matter of: Sargent, Patricia Ann
May 13, 2024 | Tetreau, Hon. Roxann | Estates and Administration | Formal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | WO24P1677EA

Document

In the matter of: Tatro, Fred Napoleon
May 29, 2024 | Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | Estates and Administration | Formal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | BR24P1376EA

Document

In the matter of: Leahy, Jr., Joseph M
May 29, 2024 | Peterson, Hon. Lee M. | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | NO24P1481EA

Document

In the matter of: Heath, Michael
May 15, 2024 | Doyle, Hon. Dana | Estates and Administration | Informal Appointment of Personal Representative | BE24P0369EA

Document

In the matter of: Vokes, Norman A.
May 13, 2024 | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | WO24P1634EA

Document

In the matter of: Rosen, Jerald Fred
May 31, 2024 | Gorman, Hon. Patricia | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | NO24P1507EA

Document

In re the Emergency Guardianship and/or Conservatorship of Alice Roisum
Jul 03, 2024 | Cashman, William | Guardianship/Conservatorship | Guardianship/Conservatorship | 73-PR-24-5109