Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fesili, Rosa, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2014 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.