We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Sentinel Ins. Co., Ltd. V. Chronomite Laboratories, Inc., Et Al.

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

filed a(n) General Civil - Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

January 28, 2021

Last Refreshed

May 14, 2022

Filing Location

San Luis Obispo County, CA

Category

Civil

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case Events

Type Description
Tentative Ruling A. BACKGROUND Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (“Plaintiff”) filed this action on January 10, 2018, against Chronomite Laboratories, Inc. (“Chronomite”). On June 6, 2018 and January 16, 2019, Plaintif...

Judge: Ginger E. Garrett

See all events