Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Arvey Lyons Sr. And Pearlie Lyons As Trustees Of The Arvey And Pearlie Lyons Family Trust, Obi Ephraim O., Trotter Tonya, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Obi Ephraim Okechukwu, Stone Jason M., Udeozor Benard, against Lyons Arvey Sr., Obi Ephraim O., Trotter Tonya Aka Tonya Obi, represented by Obi Ephraim Okechukwu, Stone Jason Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamona G. See Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management184 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff); Tonya Trotter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jason Stone (Attorney); Arvey Lyons, sr. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Defendant); Tonya Trotter (Defendant); TONYA TROTTER (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Opposition Demurrer; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Opposition Motionin Limine#2; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Arvey Lyons, sr. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tonya Trotter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service; Filed by: Arvey Lyons, sr. (Defendant); As to: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Arvey Lyons, sr. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff); Tonya Trotter (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Hearing Date; Filed by: Ephraim O. Obi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Defendant Arvey Lyons' Notice of and Demurrer to Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Ephraim O. Obi))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Defendant Arvey Lyons' Notice of and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Notice of Related Case The Court is in receipt...))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Tonya Trotter))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Hearing Date
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's, Arvey Lyons, Sr.?s Demurrer to Plaintiffs? Secon...))
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/08/2020)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuation of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice to Appear at Trial to Plaintiff Ephraim O. Obi
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00DEFENDANT ARVEY LYONS' ANSWER TO THE SECOND AMENDED SAC
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (Motionin Limine#2)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice to Appear at Trial to Plaintiff Tonya Trotter
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.