Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fakhiri Naim, Richter Roofing Co., J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Loeb Steven Scott, against Fakhiri Naim, represented by Campbell Nichelo Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Windham Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice re Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Reply reply in support of exparte; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Pending Action; Filed by: J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Great American Insurance Company (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mark Richter (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Opposition Defendant's Opposition to the Ex Parte; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice Notice re Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Defendant); As to: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re sanctions against Attorney Nichelo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice (re Continuance of Hearing) Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by Great American Insurance Company (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mark Richter (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice (of Pending Action) Filed by J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: MSC Completion)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against Attorney Michael D....)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: confirmation of Prop. Stip. & ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to the Ex Parte) Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order shortening time)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 21, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application exparte application for leave...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Reply (reply in support of exparte) Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant); Mark Richter (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Filed by Richter Roofing Co., (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by J.B. Wholesale Roofing & Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice re Continuance of Hearing) Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Naim Fakhiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (exparte application for leave to file x complaint)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Pending Action)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Reply (reply in support of exparte)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order shortening time))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice (re Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice re Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: confirmation of Prop. Stip. & ...))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application exparte application for leave...))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: MSC Completion))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against Attorney Michael D....))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to the Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request (Withdrawal of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Response (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. KWASIGROCH IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re sanctions against Attorney Nichelo...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: MSC Completion))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Reply (reply in support of exparte)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/01/2019)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application exparte application for leave...))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against Attorney Michael D....))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: confirmation of Prop. Stip. & ...))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request (Withdrawal of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order shortening time))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of Pending Action)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Response (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. KWASIGROCH IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice re Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to the Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice (re Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (exparte application for leave to file x complaint)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.