Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
West Hollywood Collision Center, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kaplan Jerome Alan, against Nouri Nader, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Summons (on Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 21, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 03, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Case Management Conference)])
Date: June 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: June 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.