Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norguard Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Guerrini John Donald, against W.L.A. Flame International Inc. A Corporation, represented by Carroll Patrick C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
Complaint
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: February 19, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 07, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: June 03, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 07, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.