Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Haines Todd Frederick, He Shan Sindy, Tapper Brian Philip, against Koseoglue Adnan, Koseoglu Emine, represented by Deatherage Christopher E, Lasicka Perry Allison, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Adnan Koseoglue (Defendant); Emine Koseoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Adnan Koseoglue (Defendant); Emine Koseoglu (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance of Trial Date;) of 08/17/2020)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of Final Status Conference and Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance of Trial Date;))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.