Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sun Shih-Wen Aka Kathy Shih-Wen Sun, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Robert A. Dukes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Dukes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 22, 2018Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 11, 2019Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 11, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner)
Date: January 11, 2019Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner)
Date: January 11, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Shih-Wen Sun (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;))
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.