Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Yang Yifan filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Robert A. Dukes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Dukes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Filed by: Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: January 07, 2019Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 07, 2019Petition for Change of Name Filed by Roy Wong Young (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Roy Wong Young (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.