Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Urrutia, David A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Urrutia, Teri J., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancisca P. Tisher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Voluntary Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CONTINUED VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SETTING |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Voluntary Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CONTINUED VOLUTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SETTING |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Voluntary Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion or Request: Continuance | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of continued voluntary settlement conference setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.