Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Cynthia Krueger filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Michael J Formico, Michael J. Formico, represented by Martin Nicholas Lettunich, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2018 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited (16) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is an amended cross-complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Clara. The cross-complainants, Michael J. Formico, Sr. and Cynthia Krueger, are alleging negligence, breach of oral agreement, fraudulent misreprese...
Conference: Case Management
Date: December 04, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: May 07, 2019Motion: Discovery
Date: May 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Request | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal partial with prejudice by atty Cullen as to the Complaint only |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Reply Letter to Mr. Lettunich |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Re: 3/02/22 Substitution of Atty not entered correctly and OSC - Mr. Lettunich |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Settlement Conference Statement |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.