Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Sharmin Qureshi, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Philip D Minter, against Todd Clayton, Boxed Haus Llc, Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive, represented by Benjamin D. Harris, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Civil Unlimited.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseCivil Unlimited |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2018 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: John L. Grandsaert |
|
October 09, 2018 | Document_Filed | Case Management Statement | |
October 03, 2018 | Document_Filed | Case Management Statement | |
September 05, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Answer (Unlimited) General Denial |
|
September 05, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Answer (Unlimited) General Denial |
|
September 05, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TODD CLAYTON AND BOXED HAUS, LLC |
|
August 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: John L. Grandsaert |
|
August 07, 2018 | Document_Filed | Case Management Statement | |
August 07, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC |
|
August 07, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc. SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, SERVED ON BENJAMIN D. HARRIS ESQ, AGENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.