Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dipiero Anthony J, against Rezekalla Marvat, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraciela L. Freixes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARVAT REZEKALLA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Anthony J DiPiero (Attorney)
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARVAT REZEKALLA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.