Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Freed Kenneth Jay, against Eco Green Group Inc., represented by Levy Esq. Efrat, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Robert Schuit presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Schuit Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2018 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Summons on Amended Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ECO GREEN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Objection Evidentiary Objections; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of entry of judgment; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of case management conference) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice (of entry of judgment) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 04, 2021Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by ECO GREEN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of court's minute order re: reassignment) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by ECO GREEN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Case Management C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (causes of action and Does) Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication By Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/19/2020)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 07/24/2019)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon])
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of case management conference)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of court's minute order re: reassignment)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.