Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoff, Judith M, Schultz, Richard D., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2018 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Amended First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Report of Executor and Petition for its Settlement, for Allowance of Compensation to Attorney for Ordinary and Extraordinary Services, and for Final Distribution Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service HRG 4/19/2021-Proof of Service (Amended First & Final Account, etc.) |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Amended First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Report of Executor and Petition for its Settlement, for Allowance of Compensation to Attorney for Ordinary and Extraordinary Services, and for Final Distribution Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service HRG 3/23/2021: Amended First and Final Account and Report of Executor, etc.: Proof of Service to Zoom Hrg |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim Claim is Allowed - $380.72 - Kings Credit Services cc emailed |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Amended First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Report of Executor and Petition for its Settlement, for Allowance of Compensation to Attorney for Ordinary and Extraordinary Services, and for Final Distribution Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Creditor's Claim Kings Credit Services, A Corporation $380.72 |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Administration to Creditors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.