Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ewing, Reiley F, against Gomez, Yolanda C, represented by Tunder, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management110 days |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2018 |
Category09 Unlimited - Other Collections |
Time To Trial600 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions245 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time247 days |
Statement filed
Date: February 05, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 29, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: May 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 1-2 days Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Reiley Ewing Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed for entry of judgment and settlement and release & dismissal of action with consent to Court retaining jurisdiction Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 05.03.19** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Stipulation For Entry Of Judgment and Settlement and Release & Dismissal of Action with Consent to Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6 |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.