Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sanchez, Miguel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Freyre, Katherine E., against Alviar, Nathan, The Best Produce, Inc., represented by Eliason, Robert G., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management116 days |
Filing DateJune 07, 2018 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial529 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time419 days |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Miguel Sanchez, is suing The Best Produce, Inc., Nathan Alviar, and Does 1 to 100. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civil case. The complaint al...
Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 31, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 14, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: July 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Jury Req by both; 5-7 Days Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal of Entire Action |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Heairng |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement filed Treated as an Unconditional settlement |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.