Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Calleres, Santa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldsmith, David Allan, against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management118 days |
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 10, 2018Dismissal Not Entered
Date: October 10, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: September 18, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: May 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
18 Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously dismissed on 9/18/18 |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing Returned: Request for Dismissal Reason: Documents are being returned unprocessed. Please note effective July 1, 2016, documents filed by represented parties in all unlimited civil actions must be filed electronically. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov. |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
18 Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review HRG 09-24-18 (CMC) - Request for Dismissal |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018-06-20 Calleres - Notice of Errata Notice Filed HRG 09/24/18 Notice of Errata in Complaint |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of CMC/CJAP |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Callares Summons Summons issued and filed |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Callares - Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil case cover sheet |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Callares - Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.