Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Nathan Rizzle Romero, Romero, Raymond, Iii, Eileen Rizzle Romero, Louie Isaac Romero, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Nicholas John Paul Wagner, against Angel Matthew Castillo, Zoe Eaglebear Sunshine Barrios, Abraham Chavez, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Hanford - Civil with Donna Tarter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Tarter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseHanford - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Action | Transcript | |
May 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Donna Tarter |
|
May 10, 2019 | Action | Affidavit | |
May 10, 2019 | Action | Affidavit | |
March 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Kathy Ciuffini |
|
February 26, 2019 | Action | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 27, 2018 | Action | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 03, 2018 | Action | Notice of Judicial Assignment and Case Management Conference | |
December 03, 2018 | Action | Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem | |
December 03, 2018 | Action | Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.