Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
On Deck Capital Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Zarco Gloria, against Samatov Lotchinbek, White Knight Investments Inc An Entity, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenny C. Osorio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2018 |
CategorySister State Judgment (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Case Outcome TypeOther Clerk Judgment |
Declaration regarding non service-non estes; Filed by: On Deck Capital, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: November 26, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: On Deck Capital, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: October 04, 2018Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (regarding non service-non estes)
Date: November 26, 2018Affidavit (Of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Interest Calculation Pursuant to CCP 685.050)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: December 27, 2018Declaration (REGARDING NON SERVICE - NON ESTES)
Date: June 13, 2019Judgment
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Petition (Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.