Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnny Huynh Aka Johnny John Huynh, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenny C. Osorio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) -
Date: October 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 05, 2018Petition for Change of Name -
Date: October 05, 2018Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Johnny John Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Johnny John Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Johnny John Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Johnny John Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: November 16, 2018Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Johnny John Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Filed by: Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: November 16, 2018Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Request For Copies Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Johnny Huynh (Petitioner)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.