Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Alfaro, Vicente Coronel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.