Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Spalding, Don, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation: Owner Responsibility | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.