We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Springfield Enterprises Inc V. Jacob Gibson, Wells Fargo Bank N A

Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago

Springfield Enterprises Inc, filed a(n) Pl - Civil Plenary case represented by Stephen John Harants, against Gibson, Jacob, Wells Fargo Bank N A, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts Circuit.

Case Details for Springfield Enterprises Inc v. Gibson, Jacob , et al.

Filing Date

June 11, 2024

Category

Pl - Civil Plenary

Last Refreshed

June 16, 2024

Filing Location

Allen County, IN

Filing Court House

Circuit

Case Complaint Summary

This complaint involves Springfield Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Springfield Restoration and Remodeling suing Jacob Gibson and Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Springfield was hired to perform water remediation at Gibson's home, completing work amounting to $42,351....

Parties for Springfield Enterprises Inc v. Gibson, Jacob , et al.

Plaintiffs

Springfield Enterprises Inc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Stephen John Harants

Defendants

Gibson, Jacob

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Case Documents for Springfield Enterprises Inc v. Gibson, Jacob , et al.

Case Events for Springfield Enterprises Inc v. Gibson, Jacob , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Return of Service on Gibson - SERVED
Docket Event Certificate of Issuance of Summons to Wells Fargo Bank NA
Docket Event Affidavit Filed
Affidavit of Jeremy Sessions
Docket Event Subpoena/Summons Filed
Summons to Jacob Gibson
Docket Event Subpoena/Summons Filed
Summons to Wells Fargo
Docket Event Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Complaint with Exhibits
Docket Event Appearance Filed
Appearance of Stephen J. Harants
Docket Event Case Opened as a New Filing
Docket Event Cause Of Actions
Complaint
See all events

Related Content in Allen County

Case

Fire Police City County Federal Credit Union v. Desira Lynn Rains
Jul 09, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D01-2407-SC-005892

Case

In Re: the Guardianship of McKayla Welch
Jul 11, 2024 | GU - Guardianship | 02D03-2407-GU-000183

Case

Deerra Hughes v. Ciara Eley
Jul 08, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D02-2407-SC-005811

Case

IOM Health System LP v. Melissa Leininger
Jul 08, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D02-2407-SC-005855

Case

IOM Health System LP v. Emebet Solomon
Jul 08, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D02-2407-SC-005838

Case

DBD Homes, LLC v. Ernest S Haynes
Jul 10, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D03-2407-SC-005944

Case

Midland Credit Management Inc v. Magan Riecke
Jul 11, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D01-2407-CC-002493

Case

Three Rivers Federal Credit Union v. John P. Kohn
Jul 09, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D01-2407-SC-005890

Case

Cook Behavioral Health Clinic PC v. Andrea Royer
Jul 09, 2024 | SC - Small Claims | 02D03-2407-SC-005912

Case

Discover Bank v. Meghan Harrison
Jul 08, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D03-2407-CC-002412

Case

3 Rivers Federal Credit Union v. Megan Bunch
Jul 11, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D01-2407-CC-002474

Case

Ruysdael Georges v. Abraham Gutierrez
Jul 11, 2024 | CT - Civil Tort | 02D01-2407-CT-000461

Case

In Re: The Estate of Stephen D Smith
Jul 10, 2024 | EM - Estate, Miscellaneous | 02D03-2407-EM-000156

Document

Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Chemira M Watkins
Jul 09, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D09-2407-CC-002445

Document

Matthew J Utterback, Ashley Utterback v. Katherine A Hartzog
Jul 08, 2024 | CT - Civil Tort | 02D03-2407-CT-000450

Document

Abees LLC v. Ranger Supply Co LLC
Jul 10, 2024 | PL - Civil Plenary | 02D03-2407-PL-000322

Document

Midland Credit Management Inc v. Sonya L Cyrus
Jul 11, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D03-2407-CC-002485

Document

Mariner Finance LLC v. Sharina R. Prater
Jul 10, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D09-2407-CC-002455

Document

Autovest LLC of Indiana v. Syndra J Reynolds
Jul 10, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D01-2407-CC-002451

Document

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC v. Meghan Jackson
Jul 08, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D09-2407-CC-002431

Document

Maria C Vences, Laura Cadena v. Scott Moorehead
Jul 08, 2024 | CT - Civil Tort | 02D02-2407-CT-000451

Document

Brittani Banks, Jereign Banks, Jerome Bankset al v. Terry Poston
Jul 05, 2024 | CT - Civil Tort | 02D03-2407-CT-000449

Document

Midland Credit Management Inc v. Loleta Houston
Jul 10, 2024 | CC - Civil Collection | 02D01-2407-CC-002457

Document

Matthew J Utterback, Ashley Utterback v. Katherine A Hartzog
Jul 08, 2024 | CT - Civil Tort | 02D03-2407-CT-000450