Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Beck, Nancy A, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 223477 Date: 09/18/2018 | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - $3518.82 | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION F PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY IN SUPPORT OF CREDITS/PAYMENTS RECEIVEED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES ENTERED AS REQUESTD ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033(B) ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CMC; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE AS TO NANCY BECK BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 5/23/18 AND MAIL ON 5/24/18 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.