Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Douglas Martin, Marty Verducci, Russ Oleyer, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Amanda L Riddle, Vilmarie Cordero, against Brad A Rothfield, Edward Giron, Jesus Alacon, Maddison Group, Inc., Madison Group Security, (total of 5) See All represented by Carol Ann Humiston, Scott Aron Thompson Kron, Young Wook Ryu, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint, filed by ARRIAGA & ASSOCIATES, INC. ("A&A"), is a cross-complaint against Jason Lara and Eddie Giron. A&A is a corporation based in Santa Clara County, California. Lara and Giron were employees of A&A, serving as Regional Leads in dif...
Hearing: Demurrer
Date: August 10, 2017Motion: Compel
Date: November 30, 2017Hearing: Demurrer
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Arriaga Defendants' Request for Additional Time to File Motion to Tax Costs (hearing set for 5/10/24 at 9am in D9) - signed/Judge Alloggiamento. | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment - signed/Judge Alloggiamento. | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Proposed Judgment / Statement of Decision |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Statement of Decision - signed/Judge Julia Alloggiamento. |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice CMC reset from 12/14/23 to 4/18/24 |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) Index of Exhibits in opposition to Court's Proposed Statement of Decision |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Opposition Dania M. Baker Declaration in opposition to Court's Proposed Statement of Decision |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Court's Proposed Statement of Decision |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter HRG 6/21/23 Proposed Statement of Decision - signed by Judge Julia Alloggiamento. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.