Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hayden, Amara, against Joregensen, Karen A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerman, James E Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit, Filed | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default, Filed | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.