Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by De Guzman, Nichol Alan, against Acuna, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerman, James E Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions856 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.