Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Loannow, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vondracek, Lauren, against Salgado, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerman, James E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulated Judgment, Filed | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation, Filed | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.