Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Samaniego, Samuel O, represented by Meyer, Derek Scott, Sok, Curtis B, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Ash, Carol presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAsh, Carol Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2017 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Trial Conference
Date: November 27, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 02, 2018Arraignment: Warrant
Date: October 05, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: September 25, 2017Arraignment: Complaint
Date: August 15, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: January 12, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: November 09, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: October 26, 2018PC1538.5 Motion
Date: December 06, 2019Arraignment: Warrant
Date: November 01, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: November 30, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: June 21, 2019Motion
Date: July 26, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: August 16, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 29, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 25, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 01, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 08, 2019Motion
Date: May 24, 2019PC1538.5 Motion
Date: October 25, 2019PC1538.5 Motion
Date: September 27, 2019Pre-Trial Conference
Date: February 19, 2021Motion
Date: January 17, 2020Request
Date: June 26, 2020Pre-Trial Conference
Date: February 28, 2020Pre-Trial Conference
Date: August 14, 2020Pre-Trial Conference
Date: October 16, 2020Motion
Date: June 26, 2020Motion
Date: March 20, 2020Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 04, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 11, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 15, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: May 14, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: June 21, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: July 21, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: July 28, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Hashimoto, Roy |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.