Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guanzon, Kim, Guanzon, Larry, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Potter, Dirk Deverne, against Zanetta, Trinity, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial46 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by Larry Guanzon and Kim Guanzon against Trinity Zanetta. The plaintiffs allege that Trinity Zanetta agreed to rent the premises located at 1116 Stewart Ave., Chico, CA 95928, but failed to pay the re...
Request or Counter Request to Set Case for Trial
Date: January 17, 2018Mediation Agreement and Order
Date: February 02, 2018Judgment by Court
Date: April 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Judgment by Court Judgment by Court Amended Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Review Hearing Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Judgment
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Court Trial Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.